12 Maths Tricks (With Examples)14th January 2023by Ashish jindalDisclaimer/Notice as Provided by the Content Creator Don't copy my content.Table of Contents1. Maths Tricks for Addition2. Maths Tricks for Subtraction 3. Quick Multiplication Tricks by Breaking Down Numbers4. Multiplied By 155. Multiplication of Two-Digit Numbers6. Maths Division Tricks7. Maths Trick to Find Percentage8. Maths Magic tricks to Calculate Squares ending with digit 59. Tricks to Multiply by 2 and 410. Multiplication by 511. Multiplication by 1012. Tricks to Memorise Table of 9ConclusionImagine how mathematics would be easy and interesting when you have the ability to calculate the problems in a matter of seconds using some Maths tricks. There are different kinds of #h_6903377243271673707012304">arithmetic operations like addition, subtraction, division, multiplication, squaring, roots, powers, logarithms, divisions, etc. Here are some of the best tricks, which will help students to perform arithmetic calculations easily.1. Maths Tricks for AdditionWith the help of basic principles of tens and unit places, the addition of two-digit numbers is performed byTake 43 + 34Split the second number into tens and unit places. 34 = 30 + 4Finish the ten’s addition. 43 + 30 = 73Finally, add the remaining unit place digit. 73 + 4 = 77.2. Maths Tricks for SubtractionHere is an example that requires a lot of borrowingConsider two numbers say 1000 and 676Subtract 1 from both numbers; we get 999 and 675Then subtract 675 from 999, we get 324So, 1000 – 676 = 324. 3. Quick Multiplication Tricks by Breaking Down NumbersLet’s try the numbers 24 and 16First split the number 24, which gives 4 x 6Then multiply 6 with 16, we get 96Finally multiply the number, 96 x 4 = 384So, the multiplication of two numbers 24 x 16 gives the solution 384.4. Multiplied By 15Consider the multiplication of two numbers say 56 and 15Now add zero at the end of the first number, it becomes 560.Divide that number by 2; we get 560/2 = 280Add the resultant number with 560, so 560 + 280 = 840.So the answer for 56 and 15 is 840.5. Multiplication of Two-Digit NumbersIf anyone of the given numbers is an even number, then follow the steps to solveConsider an example, 18 x 37Here 18 is an even number, then divide the first number in half, so that 18/2 = 9Then double the second number. 37 x 2 =74Finally, multiply the resultant numbers. It becomes 74 x 9 = 6666. Maths Division TricksThe numbers that can be evenly divided by certain numbers are:If a number is an even number and ends in 0, 2, 4, 6 or 8, it is divided by 2.A number is divisible by 3 if the sum of the digits is divisible by 3. Consider the number 12 = 1 + 3 and 3 is divisible by 3.A number is divisible by 4 if the last two digits are divisible by 4. Example: 9312. Here the last two digits are 12, and 12 is divisible by 4.If the last digit is 0 or 5, it is divisible by 5If a number is divisible by 2 and 3, then it is divisible by 6, since 6 is the product of 2 and 3.If the number is divisible by 8, the last three digits of the numbers are divisible by 8.If a number is divisible by 9, the sum of the digits is divided by 9. Let us consider the example, 4518 = 4 + 5 + 1 + 8 = 18, which is divisible by 9.If the final digit of the number is 0, it is divisible by 10.7. Maths Trick to Find PercentageLet us take; we have to find the percentage of the number 5% of 475, follow the steps.For the given number, move the decimal point over by one place. 475 becomes 47.5Then divide the number 47.5 by 2, we get 18.104.22.168 is the solution to the given problem.8. Maths Magic tricks to Calculate Squares ending with digit 5Let’s consider the number 75 to find its square.Start writing the answer of last two digits number that is 25 because any number that ends with 5 is 25Take the first digit of the number 75. That is 7 and take the number that follows 7 is 8.Now, multiply 7 and 8, we get the number 56.Finally, write the number 56 in the prefix and combine with 25 what we already wrote.So, the answer is 5625.Squares Ending in 5: n5 = n(n + 1)52 = n(n + 1)25 , where n is the first digit.Example: Let’s consider the number 75 to find its square. Here n = 7,So, 75 = 7(7 + 1)25 = (7 x 8) 25 = 5625.9. Tricks to Multiply by 2 and 4When a number is multiplied by 2 or 4, then the last digit of the resulting value will be an even number always.Examples:19 x 2 = 3819 x 4 = 7610. Multiplication by 5When a number is multiplied by 5, then the resulting value will either end with 0 or 5.Examples:11 x 5 = 558 x 5 = 40121 x 5 = 60511. Multiplication by 10When a number is multiplied by 10, then the resulting value ends with 0 always.Examples:5 x 10 = 5010 x 10 = 10011 x 10 = 11017 x 10 = 170211 x 10 = 211012. Tricks to Memorise Table of 9It is easy to remember the table of 9. Just we need to focus on the pattern.09, 18, 27, 36, 45, 54, 63, 72, 81, 90We can see the numbers at the ten’s place are increasing by 1, and the numbers at the unit place are decreasing by 1.ConclusionMaths is a fun subject. Adding tricks to this subject will make it more interesting. Students will be able to solve all the complex problems using these Maths magic tricks. These tricks also help students to improve their problem-solving skills and boost their confidence. Last Seen: Jan 23, 2023 @ 4:44pm 16JanUTC Ashish jindal Ashish-jindal followers1 following0 Follow Report Content Published: 14th January 2023 Last Updated: 14th January 2023 Views: 25Tags:#hpreviousArticles in Grammar: Useful Rules, List & ExamplesnextMen, Women and Kids Leave a Reply Cancel replyYou must Register or Login to comment on this Creation.